Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Martinus Schneiders, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Makassar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1903BornHoorn
17 Aug 193026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Jun 194844.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Makassar, Indonesia
10 Jun 194844.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cos
27 Sep 194845.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cos
3 Jan 196157.3AppointedArchbishop of Makassar, Indonesia
7 Aug 197369.9ResignedArchbishop of Makassar, Indonesia
19 Feb 198278.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Makassar, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Martinus Schneiders
Archbishop Nicolas Martinus Schneiders C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Makassar

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Mar 2016