Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frans Simons, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Indore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1908BornTegelen
30 Oct 193224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
15 May 195243.8AppointedBishop of Indore, India
6 Aug 195244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Indore, India
26 Jun 197162.9ResignedBishop of Indore, India
28 Jan 200293.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Indore, India

MicroData Summary for Frans Simons:
Bishop Frans Simons S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Indore

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013