Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Antonius Eduardus van Dodewaard

Deceased

Bishop of Haarlem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1913BornArnhem
11 Jun 193825.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 195845.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
1 Jul 195845.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Clysma
9 Sep 195845.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clysma
27 Jun 196047.1SucceededBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
9 Mar 196652.8DiedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Joannes Antonius Eduardus van Dodewaard:
Bishop Joannes Antonius Eduardus van Dodewaard (born , died ) Bishop of Haarlem

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013