Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Hubert Thijssen, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larantuka, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Eguga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1906Born
31 Jan 193225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Mar 195144.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Endeh, Indonesia
8 Mar 195144.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
3 May 195144.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
3 Jan 196154.6AppointedBishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
23 Feb 197366.7ResignedBishop of Larantuka, Indonesia
23 Feb 197366.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
23 Feb 197366.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Denpasar, Indonesia
4 Sep 198074.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Denpasar, Indonesia
7 Jun 198276.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Larantuka, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Antoine Hubert Thijssen
Bishop Antoine Hubert Thijssen S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larantuka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaarlo

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018