Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm van Bekkum, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ruteng


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1910BornAchterveld
18 Aug 193525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Mar 195140.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ruteng, Indonesia
8 Mar 195140.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
13 May 195141.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
3 Jan 196150.8AppointedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
10 Mar 197261.9ResignedBishop of Ruteng, Indonesia
11 Feb 199887.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ruteng, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm van Bekkum:
Bishop Wilhelm van Bekkum S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ruteng

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015