Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ketapang

Dioecesis Ketapangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pius Riana Prapdi, Bishop
  • Blasius Pujoraharja, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pontianak
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 34,600 (13,364 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. A. Yani 74, Kotak Pos 175, Ketapang 78811, Kalbar, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0534)32.181
  • Fax: 31.008

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ketapang
14 June 1954ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Pontianak Prefecture Apostolic of Ketapang (erected)
Diocese of Ketapang
3 January 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ketapang Diocese of Ketapang
9 April 1968Territory LostDiocese of Ketapang
Archdiocese of Pontianak
Prefecture Apostolic of Sekadau (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ketapang
19695,729204,1822.8%1181930130287ap1971
198019,593230,0008.5%116171,1523535ap1981
199040,953308,36113.3%107172,409252612ap1991
199973,747397,35718.6%196252,9492612214ap2000
200075,247411,70518.3%207272,7861612214ap2001
200171,726407,32617.6%206262,7581512216ap2002
200276,969423,92818.2%199282,7481513117ap2003
200380,672435,47518.5%1710272,9872112616ap2004
200484,297438,47519.2%1911302,809298715ap2005
200688,301431,00020.5%1610263,3962411017ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 9 Sep 2012