Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Merauke

Archidioecesis Meraukensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Nicolaus Adi Seputra, M.S.C., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 90,000 (34,762 Square Miles)
  • Blog: http://kamerauke.blogspot.com/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Jl. Mandala 30, Merauke 99602, Irian Jaya, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0971)321.011
  • Fax: 321.311

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Merauke
24 June 1950ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Amboina Vicariate Apostolic of Merauke (erected)
Archdiocese of Merauke
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Merauke Archdiocese of Merauke
29 May 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Merauke Diocese of Agats (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Merauke
197069,12993,94273.6%2328511,3555642ap1971
198088,240113,00078.1%323263,3934331ap1981
1990106,809180,61959.1%227293,6833633ap1991
1999129,650243,25453.3%428324,0513335ap2000
2000132,929247,00053.8%527324,1543342ap2001
2001133,202231,08657.6%527324,1623147ap2002
2002134,066231,93357.8%626324,189315426ap2003
2003137,117235,22958.3%727344,032304826ap2004
2004140,220244,44057.4%726334,249295126ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 22 Jul 2012