Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
14 Apr 1969 | Born | ||
8 Sep 1997 | 28.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Kupang, Indonesia |
9 Mar 2024 | 54.9 | Appointed | Archbishop of Kupang, Indonesia |
9 May 2024 | 55.0 | Ordained Bishop | Archbishop of Kupang, Indonesia |
(WikiData: Q124797469)
Father
Hironimus
Pakaenoni
(born )
Archbishop-Elect
of Kupang
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Noemuti, Diocese of Atambua |
Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Kupang.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 18 Mar 2024 |
✠