Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Giorgio Micchiardi

Bishop of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1942 BornCarignano
26 Jun 196623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Dec 199048.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Dec 199048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Maior
13 Jan 199148.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Maior
9 Dec 200058.1AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
4 Feb 200158.2InstalledBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Giorgio Micchiardi:
Bishop Pier Giorgio Micchiardi (born ) Bishop of Acqui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Acqui.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,438
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 10 Jan 2015