Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Lanzetti

Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1942 BornCarmagnola
26 Jun 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Jun 200260.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Jun 200260.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariana in Corsica
20 Jul 200260.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariana in Corsica
29 Sep 200664.4AppointedBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
28 Jun 201068.1AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
2 Oct 201068.4InstalledBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
24 Sep 201573.4ResignedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Lanzetti
Bishop Giacomo Lanzetti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alba (Pompea)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alba (Pompea).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,231
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016