Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Olteanu

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1839Born
5 Apr 186323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
29 Nov 187030.9AppointedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
18 Dec 187031.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
16 Sep 187333.7SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
22 Dec 187334.0ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
24 Jan 187434.1InstalledBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
29 Nov 187737.9DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Olteanu
Bishop Ioan Olteanu (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSântesci, Diocese of Lugoj (Romanian)
Ordained BishopOradea Mare, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)

  • a priest for 14.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 354, and Page 359
  • c2: CB, 26 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017