Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandru Şterca Şuluţiu de Kerpenyes

Deceased

Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1794Born
1814¹19.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 185056.7SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
17 Feb 185157.0ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
22 Jul 185157.4Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
16 Nov 185460.7AppointedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
7 Sep 186773.5DiedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandru Şterca Şuluţiu de Kerpenyes (VIAF: 78051724)
Archbishop Alexandru Şterca Şuluţiu de Kerpenyes (born , died ) Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbrudbánya, Diocese of Făgăraş (Romanian)

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016