Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandru Dobra

Deceased

Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1794Born
25 Oct 181824.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 181824.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 185460.0SelectedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
16 Nov 185460.7ConfirmedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
28 Oct 185561.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
13 Apr 187076.1DiedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Alexandru Dobra
Bishop Alexandru Dobra (born , died ) Bishop of Lugoj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeptér, Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,846
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016