Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasile Erdély

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1794³BornMakň
12 Nov 182026.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 184248.0SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
30 Jan 184348.5ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
11 Jun 184348.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
27 Mar 186267.7DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vasile Erdély:
Bishop Vasile Erdély (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013