Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Alexi

Deceased

Bishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1800Born
23 Oct 182525.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Oct 182525.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 185453.7SelectedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
16 Nov 185454.3ConfirmedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
28 Oct 185555.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
29 Jun 186363.0DiedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Alexi
Bishop Ioan Alexi (born , died ) Bishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaladia

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,847
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018