Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Djordje Smičiklas

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1815BornReštovo
11 Apr 184125.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 185741.5SelectedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
21 Dec 185742.0ConfirmedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
21 Mar 185842.3Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
20 Apr 188165.3DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Djordje Smičiklas:
Bishop Djordje Smičiklas (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013