Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Zenner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1794Born
30 Aug 181823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Feb 185156.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Feb 185156.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
30 Mar 185156.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
29 Oct 186166.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Zenner (VIAF: 47195504)
Bishop Franz Xaver Zenner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne Cathedral, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 502
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017