Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomäus Widmer

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1802Born
12 Aug 182725.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 185957.2SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
23 Mar 186057.6ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
17 Jun 186057.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
30 Sep 187270.1ResignedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
17 May 188380.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Bartholomäus Widmer
Bishop Bartholomäus Widmer (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrainburg, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017