Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz Feigerle

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1795Born
21 Mar 181822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
2 Dec 185156.6SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
15 Mar 185256.9ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
25 Apr 185257.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
27 Sep 186368.4DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Feigerle (VIAF: 25353764)
Bishop Ignaz Feigerle (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiskupstwo (Mähren)
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017