Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Alojzy Pukalski

Deceased

Bishop of Tarnów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1798BornCieszyn
22 Sep 182123.5Ordained PriestPriest
1830²31.8IncardinatedPriest of Tarnów, Poland
31 Jul 185153.4SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
15 Mar 185254.0ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
23 May 185254.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
29 Jun 185254.3InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
6 Jan 188586.8DiedBishop of Tarnów, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Alojzy Pukalski:
Bishop Józef Alojzy Pukalski (born , died ) Bishop of Tarnów

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,393
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 536

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013