Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakub (Iacobus) Bosagi, C.M.Vd. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1808Born
22 Dec 182921.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
16 Aug 185546.8AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna
11 Sep 185546.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
4 Nov 185547.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
1 Oct 188375.0DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

MicroData Summary for Jakub (Iacobus) Bosagi
Archbishop Jakub (Iacobus) Bosagi C.M.Vd. (born , died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Vienna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncyrae
Ordained BishopMechitarists Church, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1855, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016