Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mato Vodopić

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1816Born
15 Nov 184023.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
22 Nov 184023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
19 Mar 188265.2SelectedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
3 Jul 188265.5ConfirmedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
3 Sep 188265.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
13 Mar 189376.2DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Mato Vodopić (VIAF: 38023914)
Bishop Mato Vodopić (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa, Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)
Ordained BishopSrs. Heimmeul Renwez, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017