Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gábor Máriássy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1807Born
10 Apr 183022.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Jun 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186557.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
27 Mar 186557.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
14 May 186557.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
26 Oct 187164.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gábor Máriássy
Bishop Gábor Máriássy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIgló
Ordained BishopEger, Archdiocese of Eger

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 435
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast