Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ioan Vancea (Vancsa)

Deceased

Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1820³Born
22 Jul 184525.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
29 Jul 184525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
7 Sep 186545.3SelectedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
25 Sep 186545.3ConfirmedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
3 Dec 186545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
28 Jan 186645.6InstalledBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
21 Nov 186848.5SelectedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
21 Dec 186848.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
11 Apr 186948.8InstalledArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
31 Jul 189272.2DiedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ioan Vancea (Vancsa) (VIAF: 81680290)
Archbishop Ioan Vancea (Vancsa) (born , died ) Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVassad, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)
Ordained BishopGran Varadino, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123, and Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017