Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Pável

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1827Born
14 Mar 185224.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Mar 185224.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 187245.0SelectedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
23 Dec 187245.2ConfirmedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
26 Jan 187345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
29 Jan 187951.3SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
15 May 187951.6ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
8 Jun 187951.7InstalledBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
1 Jun 190274.7DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Mihály Pável
Bishop Mihály Pável (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLénárdfalva

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123, and Page 359
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017