Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Szabó

Deceased

Bishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1836Born
4 Sep 185923.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 187942.5SelectedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
15 May 187942.7ConfirmedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
3 Aug 187942.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
2 May 191174.7DiedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Szabó (VIAF: 121988718)
Bishop Ioan Szabó (born , died ) Bishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsztró, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)
Ordained BishopOradea Mare, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,131
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017