Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetriu Radu

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1861Born
26 Jul 188523.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 189635.0SelectedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
3 Dec 189635.1ConfirmedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
9 May 189735.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
25 Jun 190341.6AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
16 Aug 190341.8InstalledBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
9 Dec 192059.1DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Demetriu Radu (VIAF: 141475938)
Bishop Demetriu Radu (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTompaháza, Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
Ordained BishopBlaj

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 354, and Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017