Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vasile (Basile) Suciu

Deceased

Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1873Born
14 Jul 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
9 Aug 191946.5AppointedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
25 Jan 192047.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
25 Jan 193562.0DiedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Vasile (Basile) Suciu
Archbishop Vasile (Basile) Suciu (born , died ) Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCopĀcel

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018