Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Vasile Aftenie

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Titular Bishop of Ulpiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1899Born
1 Jan 192626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
12 Apr 194040.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
12 Apr 194040.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
5 Jun 194040.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulpiana
10 May 195050.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
2 Jun 2019Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Vasile Aftenie
Bishop Bl. Vasile Aftenie (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodroman

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,940, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast