Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Balan

Deceased

Bishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1880Born
7 Jul 190323.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 193656.5AppointedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
18 Oct 193656.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
4 Aug 195979.4DiedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Balan
Bishop Ioan Balan (born , died ) Bishop of Lugoj

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeius

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018