Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Alexandru Rusu

Deceased

Bishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1884Born
20 Jul 191025.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 193045.9AppointedBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
30 Jan 193146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
2 Feb 193146.1InstalledBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
9 May 196378.4DiedBishop of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
2 Jun 2019Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Alexandru Rusu (VIAF: 6077119)
Bishop Bl. Alexandru Rusu (born , died ) Bishop of Maramureş

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaulia de Campie
Death PlacePrison, Gherla

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,797
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,900
  • bp/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Jun 2019

Quantcast