Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Titu Liviu Chinezu

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Titular Bishop of Regiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1904Born
31 Jan 193025.1Ordained PriestPriest
1949²44.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
1949²44.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiana
3 Dec 194944.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiana
15 Jan 195550.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
2 Jun 2019Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Titu Liviu Chinezu
Bishop Bl. Titu Liviu Chinezu (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuduc
Death PlacePrison, Sighetul Marmatiei

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • bd/op/ab/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,541
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast