Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Kuković

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1782³Born
2 Jan 180522.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jun 180522.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 183451.6SelectedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
30 Sep 183451.8ConfirmedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
23 Nov 183451.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
2 Dec 1849³67.0ResignedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
17 Apr 186178.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Kuković (VIAF: 221159169)
Bishop Josip Kuković (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZagreb

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018