Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Istvan Pribék de Ville

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1814Born
22 Jul 183723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Jul 183723.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 187258.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
23 Dec 187258.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
6 Mar 187358.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
25 Mar 187359.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
1902¹87.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Istvan Pribék de Ville
Bishop Istvan Pribék de Ville (born , died 1902) Auxiliary Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKenese, Diocese of Veszprém
Ordained BishopVeszprém, Diocese of Veszprém

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 349
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,651
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017