Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zsigmond Kovács

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1820Born
6 Dec 184323.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jan 184423.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 186948.2SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Jun 186948.6ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
13 Aug 186948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
6 May 187756.5SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
25 Jun 187756.6ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
18 Jun 188766.6DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Zsigmond Kovács
Bishop Zsigmond Kovács (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBánokszentgyörgy
Ordained BishopGran

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 474, and Page 588
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017