Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Szabó

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1814³Born
29 Oct 183622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Apr 183722.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 186954.7SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
5 Nov 186955.0ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
21 Nov 186955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
28 Feb 188166.3DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Imre Szabó (VIAF: 122283609)
Bishop Imre Szabó (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBékás, Diocese of Veszprém
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 489
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017