Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihály Kubinszky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1824Born
3 Jul 184823.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kalocsa, Hungary
5 Jul 184823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Apr 187651.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Apr 187651.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
30 Apr 187651.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
23 Feb 188156.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Mihály Kubinszky
Bishop Mihály Kubinszky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunapataj
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 554
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,657
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017