Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Palásthy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Sarepta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1825Born
7 Jun 184823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Jun 184823.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 188661.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
4 May 188661.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
9 May 188661.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
24 Sep 189974.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Pál Palásthy (VIAF: 89368916)
Bishop Pál Palásthy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagyar-Izsép
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 502
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017