Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Farkas

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1788Born
25 Jul 181324.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
26 Jul 181324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
29 Apr 185162.7SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
5 Sep 185163.0ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
1 Nov 185163.2Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
7 Jan 186677.4DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Farkas
Bishop Imre Farkas (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamoly, Diocese of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 84
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017