Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Póka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Cubda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1916Born
9 Jul 193923.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 198266.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary
5 Apr 198266.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cubda
21 Apr 198266.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cubda
3 Mar 198770.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György Póka
Bishop György Póka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerkaszentmiklós
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Esztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,867

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast