Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pál Reizer

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1943BornTurulung
2 Apr 196724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad} and Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
14 Mar 199047.2AppointedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
1 May 199047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
18 Apr 200259.3DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Pál Reizer:
Bishop Pál Reizer (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,875
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013