Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Endre Gyulay

Bishop Emeritus of Szeged-Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1930 BornBattonya
7 Jun 195322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Csanád, Hungary
5 Jun 198756.7AppointedBishop of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary
4 Jul 198756.8Ordained BishopBishop of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary
20 Jun 200675.8RetiredBishop of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Endre Gyulay:
Bishop Endre Gyulay (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Szeged-Csanád

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Szeged-Csanád.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 25 Nov 2013