Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Béla Balás

Bishop Emeritus of Kaposvár, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1941 Born
20 Jun 196524.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 199251.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
10 Aug 199251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
17 Oct 199251.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
31 May 199352.1AppointedBishop of Kaposvár, Hungary
25 Mar 201776.0RetiredBishop of Kaposvár, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Béla Balás (VIAF: 121362266)
Bishop Béla Balás (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kaposvár

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaposvár.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,930
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017