Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Katona

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eger

Titular Bishop of Brixellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1928 BornNagykáta
7 Jun 195324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
3 Nov 198961.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
3 Nov 198961.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Brixellum
9 Dec 198961.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Brixellum
10 Oct 199769.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
25 Nov 201385.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for István Katona:
Bishop István Katona (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Eger

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Eger.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,674
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 25 Nov 2013