Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Secretariat for Promoting Christian Unity | |||
5 June 1960 | Established | Secretariat for Promoting Christian Unity | |
Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity | |||
28 June 1988 | Elevated | Secretariat for Promoting Christian Unity | Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity |
Dicastery for Promoting Christian Unity | |||
5 June 2022 | Elevated | Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity | Dicastery for Promoting Christian Unity |
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 14 Sep 2023 |
✠