Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Flavio Pace

Under Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Priest of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1977 Born
29 Sep 200124.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Jun 200224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
3 Feb 202042.5AppointedUnder Secretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary for Flavio Pace
Father Flavio Pace (born ) Under Secretary of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained DeaconSeminario arcivescovile, Basilica, Venegono Inferiore, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Congregation for the Oriental Churches.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2020
  • od/op/c01/loc: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 25 May 2020

Quantcast