Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Mandara

Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1952 Born
22 Apr 197825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
2 Apr 200451.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
2 Apr 200451.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania
5 Jun 200451.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania
10 Jun 201158.8AppointedBishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy
28 Aug 201159.0InstalledBishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Mandara
Bishop Ernesto Mandara (born ) Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePositano

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,606
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 8 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast