Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giorgio Marengo, I.M.C.

Prefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia

Titular Bishop of Castra Severiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1974 Born
24 Jun 200026.0ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
26 May 200126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
2 Apr 202045.8AppointedPrefect of Ulaanbaatar, Mongolia
2 Apr 202045.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
8 Aug 202046.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Marengo
Father Giorgio Marengo I.M.C. (born ) Prefect of Ulaanbaatar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy
Ordained PriestBeato Giuseppe Allamano, Church, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Ordained BishopConsolata, Church, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Ulaanbaatar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2020
  • c1/c3+: CB, 16 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Jul 2020

Quantcast