Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Paolo Benotto

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1949 BornSan Giuliano Terme
28 Jun 197323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
5 Jul 200353.8AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
7 Sep 200354.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
4 Oct 200354.0InstalledBishop of Tivoli, Italy
2 Feb 200858.4AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
6 Apr 200858.5InstalledArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Benotto:
Archbishop Giovanni Paolo Benotto (born ) Archbishop of Pisa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pisa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013