Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Parmeggiani

Bishop of Tivoli, Italy

Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1961 Born
18 Oct 198524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
25 Nov 199635.3IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 200846.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
20 Sep 200847.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
5 Oct 200847.2InstalledBishop of Tivoli, Italy
31 Jul 201756.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Palestrina, Italy
19 Feb 201957.6AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
17 Apr 201957.7InstalledBishop of Palestrina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mauro Parmeggiani (VIAF: 1793154257836124150974)
Bishop Mauro Parmeggiani (born ) Bishop of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained PriestCathedral, Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tivoli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,961
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 24 Feb 2019

Quantcast